Kish et. al. v. Merck & Co., Inc. et. al.

Plaintiff: Allen Mueller, Donald Thering, Rosemarie Case, Catherine Wade, Judith K Morris, Donna E Kish, Leonard Murrell, Barbara Kerrigan, Delores Stewart, Annamarie Defrancis, Judith K. Morris and Donna E. Kish
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Merck & Co., Inc. and McKesson Corp.
Case Number: 2:2018cv05125
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: New York Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
1 Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2018 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Eastern District of Pennsylvania as case 2:18-cv-20108, filed 09/24/2018. (Florio, Lisa)
September 21, 2018 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa)
September 21, 2018 6 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-5): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of August 2, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Harvey Bartle, III. (Florio, Lisa)
September 21, 2018 5 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-5): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of August 2, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Harvey Bartle, III. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (Florio, Lisa)
September 12, 2018 4 Notice of Related Case indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet in Case No. 18-cv-05125. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 12, 2018 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 12, 2018 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 11, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, Case Number 516293/2018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-10719072). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Matthew T. McLaughlin, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7) (McLaughlin, Matthew) Modified on 9/12/2018 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kish et. al. v. Merck & Co., Inc. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Mueller
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Thering
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Case
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Wade
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith K Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna E Kish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Murrell
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Kerrigan
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Stewart
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annamarie Defrancis
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith K. Morris
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna E. Kish
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Represented By: Matthew T. McLaughlin
Represented By: Adam Gordon Possidente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T. McLaughlin
Represented By: Adam Gordon Possidente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?