In re: Application Pursuant to 38 U.S.C. 2251(C)(5) for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testifcandum for the Production of Brian Dement
Petitioner: Brian Dement
In Re: Application Pursuant to 38 U.S.C. 2251(C)(5) for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testifcandum for the Production of Brian Dement
Case Number: 2:2018cv05161
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arthur D Spatt
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 14, 2018 CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. (Coleman, Laurie)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for the Production of Brian Dement. Request denied. Case closed. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 9/14/2018. (Coleman, Laurie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0207-10723534, filed by Brian Dement. Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - No. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Writ of Habeas Corpus) (Cernitz, Henry) Modified on 9/17/2018 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Application Pursuant to 38 U.S.C. 2251(C)(5) for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testifcandum for the Production of Brian Dement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Dement
Represented By: Henry J. Cernitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Application Pursuant to 38 U.S.C. 2251(C)(5) for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testifcandum for the Production of Brian Dement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?