Stoltz v. Long Island Rail Road Company

Plaintiff: Thomas J. Stoltz
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv05532
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bianco
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Adjourn Conference /Enter Discovery Plan by Thomas J. Stoltz. (Lauriello, Valerie)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Long Island Rail Road Company. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company, filed by Thomas J. Stoltz. (Flynn, Michael)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re #8 : The stipulation regarding the amendment to the complaint is so Ordered. Upon receipt of this Order, plaintiff is directed to serve and file a copy of the amended complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/29/2018. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by Thomas J. Stoltz (Lauriello, Valerie) Modified on 10/29/2018 (Imrie, Robert).
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Rail Road Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Metro North Commuter Railroad for Long Island Rail Road Company. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas J. Stoltz. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Lauriello, Valerie)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 3, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10773382 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by Thomas J. Stoltz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lauriello, Valerie) Modified on 10/3/2018 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoltz v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Stoltz
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Represented By: Michael D. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?