Biocogent, LLC v. Evans Transportation Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Biocogent, LLC
Defendant: Evans Transportation Services, Inc., XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. and XPO Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv05545
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for defendants XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. and XPO Logistics, Inc. to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to and including 12/7/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/30/2018. (Jacobwitz, Beth)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT by Biocogent, LLC. (Tenenbaum, Alan)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Biocogent, LLC. XPO Logistics, Inc. served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Tenenbaum, Alan)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Biocogent, LLC. XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Tenenbaum, Alan)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Biocogent, LLC. Evans Transportation Services, Inc. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Tenenbaum, Alan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Evans Transportation Services, Inc., XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., and XPO Logistics, Inc. (Cubano, Jazmin)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Biocogent, LLC (Braginsky, Philip)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Biocogent, LLC (Braginsky, Philip)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Biocogent, LLC (Braginsky, Philip)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 4, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 4, 2018 Proposed summons is rejected; the sections that read "To: (Defendant's name and address)" and "The answer or motion must be served on plaintiff or plaintiff's attorney, whose name and address are:" have not be completed; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summons in PDF fillable format using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evans Transportation Services, Inc., XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10775569 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Biocogent LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Braginsky, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biocogent, LLC v. Evans Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biocogent, LLC
Represented By: Alan Tenenbaum
Represented By: Philip Braginsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evans Transportation Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?