Ollek et al v. Long Island Rail Road Company

Plaintiff: Michael G Ollek, Daniel Ollek and Michael Ollek
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv05696
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Nina Gershon
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Blumenschein, William)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Blumenschein, William)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 A.M. on 1/10/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 1/10/2019 Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/21/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #7 is granted. Defendant Long Island Rail Road Company shall file their answer on or before 12/11/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/21/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Nina Gershon and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Judge Joanna Seybert, Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Ollek, Daniel Ollek. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Wexler, William)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Valle, Christine)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Daniel Ollek, Michael Ollek (Wexler, William)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 12, 2018 Proposed summons is rejected; the section that reads "The answer or motion must be served on plaintiff or plaintiff's attorney, whose name and address are:" has not be completed; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons. Counsel is advised to submit a completed proposed summons in PDF fillable format using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-10822749, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Michael Ollek, Daniel Ollek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Wexler, William) Modified on 10/12/2018 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ollek et al v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G Ollek
Represented By: William D. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ollek
Represented By: William D. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ollek
Represented By: William D. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: Christopher P. Yodice
Represented By: William J. Blumenschein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?