PNC Equipment Finance, LLC v. Montauk Transport Service Inc. et al

Plaintiff: PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
Defendant: Montauk Transport Service Inc., Montauk Bus Transportation Group, LLC and John B Mensch, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2018cv05883
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Joseph F Bianco
1 Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 12:1725
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Equipment Finance, LLC. John B Mensch, Jr. served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Foster, Peter)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Equipment Finance, LLC. Montauk Bus Transportation Group, LLC served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Foster, Peter)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Equipment Finance, LLC. Montauk Transport Service Inc. served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Foster, Peter)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 2, #2 3) (Bollbach, Jean)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by PNC Equipment Finance, LLC (Foster, Peter)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by PNC Equipment Finance, LLC (Foster, Peter)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by PNC Equipment Finance, LLC (Foster, Peter)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 22, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 22, 2018 Proposed summonses are rejected; the section that reads "The answer or motion must be served on plaintiff or plaintiff's attorney, whose name and address are:" has not be completed; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses in PDF fillable format using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John B Mensch, Jr., Montauk Bus Transportation Group, LLC, Montauk Transport Service Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10858771 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by PNC Equipment Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Montauk Transport, #3 Proposed Summons Montauk Bus, #4 Proposed Summons Mensch) (Foster, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Equipment Finance, LLC v. Montauk Transport Service Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montauk Transport Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montauk Bus Transportation Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B Mensch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
Represented By: Peter Bradley Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?