Fried v. Deere & Company et al

Plaintiff: Douglas Fried
Defendant: Hitachi America, LTD. and Deere & Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv06075
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: New York Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Steven I Locke
1 Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Nicole Sinnott on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Sinnott, Kristen)
November 7, 2018 6 Featured Case INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An initial conference before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke is set for 1/8/2019 10:30 a.m. in courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. See order and attachments. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 SIL Individual Rules, #2 Scheduling Order Worksheet) (Kantor, Jesse)
November 6, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Separate Affirmative Defenses by Deere & Company. (Crawford, Philip)
October 31, 2018 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 31, 2018 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
October 30, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deere & Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Crawford, Philip)
October 30, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deere & Company from Supreme Court State of New York - Nassau County, case number 613252/2018. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-10888542) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Crawford, Philip) Modified on 10/31/2018 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fried v. Deere & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi America, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Philip Warren Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Fried
Represented By: Joseph G. Dell
Represented By: Kristen Nicole Sinnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?