Corrales v. Calderon et al

Plaintiff: Gerardo Javier Corrales
Defendant: Michael J. Sposato, CO Calderon and Nassau County
Case Number: 2:2018cv06338
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Joseph F Bianco
1 Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 Letter dtd 1/3/19 fro Court to Warden/Superintendent: deft filed complaint with this Court incurring filing fees in the amount of $350.00 (as amended on 2/8/06 court filing fee increased to $350.00. Accordingly, please forward a copy of plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and disburse the payments required under 28. U.S.C. 191 S to the United Stales District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Please remember to include the above-referenced docket number on the disbursement checks before sending it to the Court. (Bollbach, Jean)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Corrales - order dtd. 11/30/18 returned - released (Bollbach, Jean)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bollbach, Jean)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of #6 Letter sent to Gerard Javier Corrales marked as return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (Cubano, Jazmin)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must forward to the United States Marshal Service for the Eastern District of New York copies of plaintiffs summonses, complaint, and this Order for service upon the defendants without prepayment of fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must mail a copy of this Order to the plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 12/30/2018. (Bollbach, Jean)cm by chambers
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gerardo Javier Corrales. (Cubano, Jazmin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 Letter dtd 11/13/18 from pro se office to pro se RE: this with acknowledge receipt of your civil action (Bollbach, Jean)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The papers are deficient as your IFP application was incomplete. (Cox, Dwayne)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gerardo Javier Corrales. (Cox, Dwayne)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Prisoner Authorization (Cox, Dwayne)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Gerardo Javier Corrales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corrales v. Calderon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Sposato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Javier Corrales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?