Gray v. Brechner et. al.
Plaintiff: Michael Gray
Defendant: Center for Advanced Public Awareness, Inc. and Clifford Brechner
Case Number: 2:2018cv06699
Filed: November 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 Letter per Indiv. Motion Practices re: grounds for plaintiff's opposition to defendants' letter proposing motion to dismiss on jurisdiction and venue grounds by Michael Gray (Bernstein, Roger)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document by Clifford Brechner. (Friedman, Andrew)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulation Extending time to ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Friedman, Andrew)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Gray. Center for Advanced Public Awareness, Inc. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Bernstein, Roger)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Gray. Clifford Brechner served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Bernstein, Roger)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Gray. (Bernstein, Roger)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Clifford Brechner, Center for Advanced Public Awareness, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Center for Advanced Public Awareness, Inc.) (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Michael Gray (Bernstein, Roger)
November 26, 2018 A completed Civil Cover Sheet was not filed - Specifically Page 2 of the document; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10963163 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Michael Gray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Bernstein, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Brechner et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Advanced Public Awareness, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Brechner
Represented By: Andrew M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gray
Represented By: Roger J. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?