Sugimoto v. Shencavitz
Petitioner: YUJI SUGIMOTO
Claimant: ROBERT SHENCAVITZ
In Re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Yuji Sugimoto
Case Number: 2:2018cv06828
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bianco
Referring Judge: Gary R Brown
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See order for full details. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 12/12/2018. (Bollbach, Jean)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Letter MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: proposed restraining order by Yuji Sugimoto. (Federici, Joseph)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet in Case No. 18-cv-06828. (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 3, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 3, 2018 Incorrect Case Entry Information. Deleted Claimant ROBERT SHENCAVITZ and added Claimant Robert Shencavitz to conform to the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 and re-entered as against Claimant. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability against Robert Shencavitz Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Yuji Sugimoto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Vessel Appraisal, #2 Exhibit B Ad Interim Security, #3 Exhibit C Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit D Proposed Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 30, 2018 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number BNYEDC-10983819 (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sugimoto v. Shencavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ROBERT SHENCAVITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: YUJI SUGIMOTO
Represented By: Joseph Robert Federici, Jr.
Represented By: James Edward Mercante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Yuji Sugimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?