Cacaccio v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Cacaccio
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan N.V. and Rite Aid Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv06916
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 2/25/2019; Rite Aid Corporation answer due 2/25/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 1/9/2019. (Minerva, Deanna)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Joseph Cacaccio. (Bursor, Scott)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Cacaccio. Mylan N.V. waiver sent on 12/26/2018, answer due 2/25/2019. (Bursor, Scott)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cacaccio. Rite Aid Corporation served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/1/2019. (Bursor, Scott)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cacaccio. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/1/2019. (Bursor, Scott)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Cacaccio. Mylan N.V. served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/1/2019. (Bursor, Scott)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Rite Aid Corporation. (Landow, Concetta)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mylan N.V. (Landow, Concetta)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Landow, Concetta)
December 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10996331 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Joseph Cacaccio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Mylan N.V., #4 Proposed Summons Rite Aid Corp.) (Bursor, Scott) Modified on 12/7/2018 (Landow, Concetta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cacaccio v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cacaccio
Represented By: Scott A. Bursor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?