Adorno v. Torres et al

Plaintiff: Marisol Adorno
Defendant: James E. Hasemann, Tiana Moretti, Jose A. Torres and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv07010
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Joan M Azrack
1 Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held on 3/20/2019 at 9:15 AM before Judge Azrack in Courtroom 920 of the Long Island Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/25/2019. (Posillico, Lauren)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD Received from Supreme Court of the State of NY, Suffolk County, 613694/2018; Received Certified Clerks Minutes and Notice of Removal. (Ortiz, Grisel)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re #4 : The time for Tiana Moretti to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including February 11, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/20/2018. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond with a Proposed Order by Tiana Moretti (Dickman, Mary) Modified on 12/20/2018 (Imrie, Robert).
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M. Dickman on behalf of United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Dickman, Mary)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tiana Moretti from Supreme Court of the State of NY, County of Suffolk, case number 613694/2018. Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adorno v. Torres et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Hasemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiana Moretti
Represented By: James H. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Mary M. Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Adorno
Represented By: Svetlana Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?