Veneziano v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Gina Veneziano
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00216
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Joan M Azrack
1 Judge: Gary R Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company is extended to 3/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/7/2019. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, With Consent by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Genovese, Amanda)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gina Veneziano. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Gottlieb, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2019: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Gina Veneziano (Gottlieb, Michael)
January 16, 2019 NOTICE : the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed ***(2 PAGE FORM)*** Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet. This document can be filed under Other Documents,please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11095081, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Gina Veneziano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Gottlieb, Michael) Modified on 1/17/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veneziano v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Amanda Lyn Genovese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Veneziano
Represented By: Michael Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?