State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Hewlett-Packard Company et. al.
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and Hewlett-Packard Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00218
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 3/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 2/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 SIL Individual Rules, #2 Scheduling Order Worksheet) (Gandiosi, Kristin)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Crossclaim, of Hewlett-Packard Company by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Lodato, Vincent)
January 21, 2019 Filing 7 Hewlett-Packard Company ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Amazon.com, Inc. by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Walker, Robert)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Hewlett-Packard Company by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Lodato, Vincent)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth S. Rose on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Rose, Beth)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Robert Lodato on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Lodato, Vincent)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amazon.com, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, Case Number 612635/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11095234). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lodato, Vincent) Modified on 1/14/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Hewlett-Packard Company et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent Robert Lodato
Represented By: Beth S. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Robert Joseph Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Stuart D. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?