Asher v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.

Plaintiff: James Asher
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.,
Case Number: 2:2019cv00243
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Nina Gershon
1 Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Florio, Lisa)
March 8, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Nina Gershon and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Judge Joseph F. Bianco, Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Florio, Lisa)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. O'Neil on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc., (notification declined or already on case) (O'Neil, Ryan)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/26/2019. (Mucciaccio, Dina)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan J. O'Neil on behalf of Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11232448. by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ryan J. O'Neil in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing) (O'Neil, Ryan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Scott Kramer on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc., (notification declined or already on case) (Kramer, J.)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/20/2019. (Mucciaccio, Dina)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Scott Kramer on behalf of Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11215520. by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of J. Scott Kramer in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing) (Kramer, J.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.,. (Carter, Ralph)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Technology, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group, N.V. for Wright Medical Technology, Inc.,. (Carter, Ralph)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Asher. Wright Medical Technology, Inc., served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (McGlamry, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael McGlamry on behalf of James Asher (notification declined or already on case) (McGlamry, Michael)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 1/18/2019. (Mucciaccio, Dina)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael L. McGlamry Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11116429. by James Asher. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (McGlamry, Michael)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 15, 2019 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Complaint was filed as against plaintiff. Entry was deleted and refiled as against defendant. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2019: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by James Asher (Walker, Renner)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in *** NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2) and CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY *** section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 FILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11098887 (Rodin, Deanna)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc., Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by James Asher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Rodin, Deanna) Modified on 1/15/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asher v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Asher
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Represented By: Michael McGlamry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.,
Represented By: Ryan J. O'Neil
Represented By: Ralph Jeffrey Carter
Represented By: J. Scott Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?