Vasquez v. Long Island Rail Road Company

Plaintiff: Jeremy Vasquez
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00264
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Gary R Brown
1 Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/4/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/4/2019. (McMorrow, Karen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Muccigrosso, Andrew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Rail Road Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit Authority, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels for Long Island Rail Road Company. (Muccigrosso, Andrew)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Vasquez. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Lauriello, Valerie)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 15, 2019 Incorrect Document Entry Information. The civil cover sheet in docket entry 1 was filed upside down; replaced it right side up. (Rodin, Deanna)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11102662, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Jeremy Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lauriello, Valerie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/15/2019) (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: Andrew G. Muccigrosso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Vasquez
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?