Drummond v. Nassau County Jail

Plaintiff: Webster Drummond
Defendant: Nassau County Jail
Case Number: 2:2019cv00272
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Joan M Azrack
1 Judge: William F Kuntz
2 Judge: Vera M Scanlon
3 Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Joan M. Azrack, Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 1/29/2019. Motions referred to Vera M. Scanlon. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Prisoner Authorization by Webster Drummond. (Cubano, Jazmin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Litigant dated 1/18/2019 Re: This letter acknowledges receipt of your civil action(s). (Ortiz, Grisel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. re MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis see document #1 Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #1 Declaration (Ortiz, Grisel)
January 15, 2019 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis see document #1 Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Webster Drummond. (Cox, Dwayne)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00166. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 9, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Transfer Order E.D.N.Y. (Complaint)(case opening only), to Webster Drummond NYSID: 04068348K B&C No: 4411808096 Vernon C. Bain Center 1 Halleck Street Bronx, NY 10474. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER. Accordingly, venue lies in the Eastern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(2), and this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/8/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2019.]
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Webster Drummond.(sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nassau County Jail. Document filed by Webster Drummond. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Webster Drummond.(sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drummond v. Nassau County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Webster Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?