Mermelstein v. United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff: Joeseph Mermelstein
Defendant: United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00312
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Without opposition, the time for Defendants the United States Department of Justice and the Federal Bureau of Investigation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 3/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/5/2019. (Vissichelli, Eric)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #5 Status Report, filed by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation : The stay of this matter is hereby lifted. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 3/4/2019. (Gapinski, Michele)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Schumacher, Robert)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT respectfully submitted to advise the Court that appropriations to the Department of Justice have been restored and requesting a lift of the stay by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation (Knapp, James)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion to Stay: The government's application, made with the consent of the plaintiff, to stay this matter due to the lapse in appropriations is granted. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 1/18/2019. (Gapinski, Michele)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay respectfully submitted on consent by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Knapp, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
January 16, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 26968 (Cox, Dwayne)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Cox, Dwayne)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Joeseph Mermelstein. (Cox, Dwayne) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2019: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mermelstein v. United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: James H. Knapp
Represented By: Robert W. Schumacher, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joeseph Mermelstein
Represented By: Arnold Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?