Calandrino v. the Farmingdale Union Free School District et. al.
Plaintiff: Alissa Calandrino
Defendant: Ralph Morales, Anthony Giordano, Marisa Moscato, Donald Cassidy, Arlene Soete, the Board of Education of the Farmingdale Union Free School District, Michael Goldberg, Luis Pena, the Farmingdale Union Free School District, Suzanne D'Amico, Yuvelin Baltar, Kathy Lively and Mario Espinosa
Case Number: 2:2019cv00443
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION re #24 Amended Complaint Declaration of CM/ECF Technical Failure by Alissa Calandrino (Phelan, Daniel)
March 19, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alissa Calandrino. (Phelan, Daniel)
March 13, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 3/13/2019 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Civil Cause for Initial Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: Daniel Palelan. Counsel for Defendant: Louis Silverman. Case called. Plaintiff to served amended complaint by 3/18/2019 at 5PM. Defendant's motion to be served by 4/1/2019. Plaintiff's opposition to be served by 5/1/2019. Reply and fully briefed motion to be served and filed with the Court by 5/13/2019. A further status conference is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 7/15/2019 at 11:15AM. (Tirado, Chelsea)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #22 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The application is denied. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/25/2019. c/ECF (Adell, April)
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled for March 13, 2019 by Yuvelin Baltar, Donald Cassidy, Suzanne D'Amico, Mario Espinosa, Anthony Giordano, Michael Goldberg, Kathy Lively, Ralph Morales, Marisa Moscato, Luis Pena, Arlene Soete, the Board of Education of the Farmingdale Union Free School District, the Farmingdale Union Free School District. (Goldstein, Joshua)
February 21, 2019 Filing 21 Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Yuvelin Baltar, Donald Cassidy, Suzanne D'Amico, Mario Espinosa, Anthony Giordano, Michael Goldberg, Kathy Lively, Ralph Morales, Marisa Moscato, Luis Pena, Arlene Soete, the Board of Education of the Farmingdale Union Free School District, the Farmingdale Union Free School District (Goldstein, Joshua)
February 12, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alissa Calandrino. Michael Goldberg served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Phelan, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alissa Calandrino. Ralph Morales served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Phelan, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alissa Calandrino. Suzanne D'Amico served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Phelan, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alissa Calandrino. Mario Espinosa served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Phelan, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alissa Calandrino. Anthony Giordano served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Phelan, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alissa Calandrino. Kathy Lively served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Phelan, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alissa Calandrino. Arlene Soete served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Phelan, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alissa Calandrino. Luis Pena served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Phelan, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alissa Calandrino. Donald Cassidy served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Phelan, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alissa Calandrino. Yuvelin Baltar served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Phelan, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alissa Calandrino. Marisa Moscato served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Phelan, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alissa Calandrino. the Board of Education of the Farmingdale Union Free School District served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Phelan, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alissa Calandrino. the Farmingdale Union Free School District served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Phelan, Daniel)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled to be held before the undersigned on 5/22/2019 is advanced to 3/13/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 at the Central Islip Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/11/2019. c/ECF (Adell, April)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Matthew Goldstein on behalf of Yuvelin Baltar, Donald Cassidy, Suzanne D'Amico, Mario Espinosa, Anthony Giordano, Michael Goldberg, Kathy Lively, Ralph Morales, Marisa Moscato, Luis Pena, Arlene Soete, the Board of Education of the Farmingdale Union Free School District, the Farmingdale Union Free School District (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Goldstein, Joshua)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis R. Silverman on behalf of Yuvelin Baltar, Donald Cassidy, Suzanne D'Amico, Mario Espinosa, Anthony Giordano, Michael Goldberg, Kathy Lively, Ralph Morales, Marisa Moscato, Luis Pena, Arlene Soete, the Board of Education of the Farmingdale Union Free School District, the Farmingdale Union Free School District (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Silverman, Lewis)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Hearing served on All Defendants on 1/24/2019, filed by Alissa Calandrino. (Phelan, Daniel)
January 24, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 5/22/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Federal Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons-the Board of Education of the Farmingdale Union Free School District, #2 Summons-Michael Goldberg, #3 Summons-Ralph Morales, #4 Summons-Suzanne D'Amico, #5 Summons-Mario Espinosa, #6 Summons-Anthony Giordano, #7 Summons-Kathy Lively, #8 Summons-Arlene Soete, #9 Summons-Luis Pena, #10 Summons-Donald Cassidy, #11 Summons-Yuvelin Baltar, #12 Summons-Marisa Moscato) (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 23, 2019 Incorrect Case Entry Information. Deleted all Defendants and re-entered Defendants to conform to the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summonses) and re-entered as against All Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 22, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number ANYEDC-11126693 (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Alissa Calandrino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons the Farmingdale Union Free School District, #3 Proposed Summons the Board of Education of the Farmingdale Union Free School District, #4 Proposed Summons Michael Goldberg, #5 Proposed Summons Ralph Morales, #6 Proposed Summons Suzanne D'Amico, #7 Proposed Summons Mario Espinosa, #8 Proposed Summons Anthony Giordano, #9 Proposed Summons Kathy Lively, #10 Proposed Summons Arlene Soete, #11 Proposed Summons Luis Pena, #12 Proposed Summons Donald Cassidy, #13 Proposed Summons Yuvelin Baltar, #14 Proposed Summons Marisa Moscato) (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calandrino v. the Farmingdale Union Free School District et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Morales
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Giordano
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisa Moscato
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Cassidy
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene Soete
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: the Board of Education of the Farmingdale Union Free School District
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Goldberg
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Pena
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: the Farmingdale Union Free School District
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne D'Amico
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuvelin Baltar
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Lively
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Espinosa
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alissa Calandrino
Represented By: Daniel O. Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?