New Falls Corporation v. Soni Holdings, LLC et. al.
Plaintiff: NEW FALLS CORPORATION
Defendant: 632 MLK JR BLVD LLC, SONI HOLDINGS, LLC, ANJALI SONI, KUNAL SONI, RICHARD SPEARS, SONI CAPITAL RESOURCES, LLC, OM P. SONI, WEANONA HUGIE, 632 MLK BLVD JR LLC and KANWAL KAPUR
Case Number: 2:2019cv00449
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arthur D Spatt
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 632 MLK BLVD JR LLC, WEANONA HUGIE, KANWAL KAPUR, OM P. SONI, SONI CAPITAL RESOURCES, LLC, RICHARD SPEARS, Anjali Soni, Kunal Soni, Soni Holdings, LLC. (Coleman, Laurie)
March 15, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by New Falls Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Newark Deed and Transfer Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Correction, #3 Proposed Summons for Amended Complaint) (Giordano, Steven)
February 28, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 MOTION for Bond Defendants' Motion to Increase Amount of Bond filed by New Falls Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation in Opposition, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Amended Order to Show Cause and Supporting Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Deposit Reciept and Letter) (Giordano, Steven)
February 28, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Bond Defendants' Motion to Increase Amount of Bond by 632 MLK BLVD JR LLC, Anjali Soni, Kunal Soni, Soni Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support to Increase Bond, #2 Affirmation in Support, #3 Affidavit in Support) (Reynolds, Kenneth)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph F. Bianco no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 2/28/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself from the above-captioned case. Judge Arthur D. Spatt recused. Case reassigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco for all further proceedings. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 2/27/2019. (Coleman, Laurie)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt for all further proceedings. Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 2/25/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by 632 MLK BLVD JR LLC, Anjali Soni, Kunal Soni, Soni Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Reynolds, Kenneth)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by New Falls Corporation. See also ECF #17 (Opposition) and ECF #21 (Reply). Motion respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson for a Report & Recommendation. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/22/2019.c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #17 Affidavit, filed by 632 MLK BLVD JR LLC, Kunal Soni, Soni Holdings, LLC, Anjali Soni, #21 Reply in Support, filed by New Falls Corporation: To the extent not already done so, by February 22, 2019, the parties are directed to provide Chambers with courtesy copies of their respective papers regarding the Court's Order to Show Cause #9 . Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/14/2019.c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia)
February 13, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY in Support re #9 Order to Show Cause,, Temporary Restraining Order, filed by New Falls Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fabricated Family Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Payment History, #3 Exhibit C - Pages 26-27 of Deposition of Kunal Soni, #4 Exhibit D - 2014 Tax Return Schedule E, #5 Exhibit E - Pages 170-171 of Deposition of Kunal Soni) (Giordano, Steven)
February 13, 2019 Filing 20 Letter Regarding Defendants' Motion to Increase the Amount of the Rule 65(c) Bond by 632 MLK BLVD JR LLC, Anjali Soni, Kunal Soni, Soni Holdings, LLC (Reynolds, Kenneth)
February 6, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 2/6/2019 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Civil Cause for Status Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: Steve Giordano. Counsel for Defendant: Kenneth Reynolds. Court Reporter: F. Guerino. Case called. Plaintiff's reply to the motion to be served by 2/13/2019. TRO extended pending determination of the motion. An in-person status is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 4/17/2019 at 11:15AM. (Tirado, Chelsea)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Compliance: $ 2500.00 placed in a non-interest bearing account as per document #9 , receipt number 27073. (Kanellopoulos, John)
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #9 Order to Show Cause,, Temporary Restraining Order, #6 Affidavit in Support Affirmation in Opposition by 632 MLK BLVD JR LLC, Anjali Soni, Kunal Soni, Soni Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kunal Soni) (Reynolds, Kenneth)
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Reynolds on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Reynolds, Kenneth)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Order to Show Cause with Supporting Documents served on Soni Holdings, LLC; 632 MLK BLVD JR LLC; Anjali Soni; Kunal Soni on 1/30/2019, filed by New Falls Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Amended Order to Show Cause and Supporting Documens on 632 MLK BLVD JR LLC, #2 Affidavit of Service of Amended OSC with Supporting Documents on Anjali Soni, #3 Affidavit of Service of Amended OSC with Supporting Documents on Kunal Soni) (Giordano, Steven)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Falls Corporation. Kunal Soni served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (Giordano, Steven)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Falls Corporation. Anjali Soni served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (Giordano, Steven)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Falls Corporation. 632 MLK BLVD JR LLC served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Giordano, Steven)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Falls Corporation. Soni Holdings, LLC served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Giordano, Steven)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 1/24/2019 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Civil Cause for Order to Show Cause. Counsel for Plaintiff: Steven Paul Giordano. Counsel for Defendant: Not Present. Court Reporter: P. Lombardi. Case called. A further status conference is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 2/6/2019 at 11:15AM. (Tirado, Chelsea)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 *AMENDED* ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - **And it is if further, ORDERED, that Plaintiff shall give security in the amount of $2,500.00 in the form of cash, attorney's check r bond, deliverable to the Clerk's Office. (Said security is to be held in a non-interest bearing account. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/24/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED, that Defendants or their attorney show cause before the Honorable Sandra J. Feuerstein at the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, Courtroom 1010, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, NY, on 2/6/2019 at 11:15AM, why an Order should not be made and entered... ORDERED, that pending the determination on this matter, the Defendants, their representatives, agents, successors and assigns are hereby restrained from selling, transferring, conveying, hypothecating, mortgaging, liening, encumbering, or otherwise disposing of the Defendants' interest in the premises known as and located at 632-634 MLK Jr. Boulevard, Newark, New Jersey 07102, and it is further ORDERED, that opposition papers be served and filed so that they are received by counsel for the Plaintiff on or before 2/4/2019, and it is further ORDERED, that a copy of this Order together with the papers upon which it is granted, be served on Defendants pursuant to Rule 4 on or before 1/31/2019. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/24/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 Affirmation Of Good Faith pursuant to Local Rule 6.1 re: #5 Proposed Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order by New Falls Corporation. (Cox, Dwayne)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; Affirmation in Support re: #5 Proposed Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order by New Falls Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Cox, Dwayne) Modified docket text to add motion for preliminary injunction on 2/22/2019 (Florio, Lisa).
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order by New Falls Corporation (Cox, Dwayne)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 24, 2019 Incorrect Case Entry Information. Deleted all Defendants and re-entered Defendants to conform to the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 and re-entered as against All Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by New Falls Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Deed, #2 Exhibit B-Certificate of Correction, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons) (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 23, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number ANYEDC-11129066 (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Falls Corporation v. Soni Holdings, LLC et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW FALLS CORPORATION
Represented By: Steven Paul Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 632 MLK JR BLVD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONI HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth A. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANJALI SONI
Represented By: Kenneth A. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KUNAL SONI
Represented By: Kenneth A. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD SPEARS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONI CAPITAL RESOURCES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OM P. SONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEANONA HUGIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 632 MLK BLVD JR LLC
Represented By: Kenneth A. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KANWAL KAPUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?