Great American Insurance Company of New York v. Kohler, Co.
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company and Great American Insurance Company of New York
Defendant: Kohler, Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00458
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of Judge Feuerstein's Order referring discovery to this Court, this case is set down for a discovery conference on April 4, 2019 at noon. To the extent the parties have not served initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a), they are instructed to do so before the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/15/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 3/13/2019 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Civil Cause for Initial Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: Nelson Canter, via telephone. Counsel for Defendant: Erin Maccan. Case called. All discovery is respectfully referred to the assigned magistrate judge. All discovery shall complete by 12/31/2019. A pretrial conference is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 2/4/2020 at 11:15AM. (Tirado, Chelsea)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD Received from the Suffolk County Clerk's Office - Enclosing a Certified Copy of Clerk's Minutes for E-filed Supreme Court case, Index #600084-19, along with a copy of the Notice of Removal. (Tirado, Chelsea)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kohler, Co. identifying Corporate Parent Kohler, Co. for Kohler, Co.. (Mackin, Erin)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 Def Kohler, Co. ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Kohler, Co.. (Mackin, Erin)
January 24, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Federal Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Kohler, Co. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 600084/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11130505). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - No. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service) (Mackin, Erin) Modified on 1/24/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #3 Exhibits A & B) (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company of New York v. Kohler, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohler, Co.
Represented By: Erin Nicole Mackin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Nelson E. Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?