Gesualdi et al v. S. Di Fazio and Sons Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Louis Bisignano, Frank H. Finkel, Michael Bourgal, Denise Richardson, Michael O'Toole, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Thomas Corbett, Darin Jeffers and Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr.
Defendant: Faztec Industries, Inc., S. Di Fazio and Sons Construction, Inc., Other John Doe Entities 1 Through 10, West Shore Trucking, Inc., John and Jane Does 1 Through 100, John Doe Corporations 1 through 10 and DiFazio Industries, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00771
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Louis Bisignano, Thomas Gesualdi, Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Denise Richardson, Marc Herbst, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. Faztec Industries, Inc. served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Smith, Christopher)
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Louis Bisignano, Thomas Gesualdi, Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Denise Richardson, Marc Herbst, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. DiFazio Industries, LLC served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Smith, Christopher)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 5/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 SIL Individual Rules, #2 Scheduling Order Worksheet) (Gandiosi, Kristin)
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Louis Bisignano, Thomas Gesualdi, Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Denise Richardson, Marc Herbst, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. West Shore Trucking, Inc. waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Smith, Christopher)
February 28, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Louis Bisignano, Thomas Gesualdi, Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Denise Richardson, Marc Herbst, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. S. Di Fazio and Sons Construction, Inc. waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Smith, Christopher)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, by DiFazio Industries, LLC. (Internicola, Charles)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 Letter by DiFazio Industries, LLC (Internicola, Charles)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles N. Internicola on behalf of DiFazio Industries, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Internicola, Charles)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Joseph Muller on behalf of Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson (aty to be noticed) (Muller, Arthur)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Michael Bardavid on behalf of Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson (aty to be noticed) (Bardavid, Jonathan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to the Court by Faztec Industries, Inc. (Sullivan, Peter)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, by Faztec Industries, Inc.. (Sullivan, Peter)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R. Sullivan on behalf of Faztec Industries, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Sullivan, Peter)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson (Smith, Christopher)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DiFazio Industries, LLC, Faztec Industries, Inc., John Doe Corporations 1 through 10, John and Jane Does 1 Through 100, Other John Doe Entities 1 Through 10, S. Di Fazio and Sons Construction, Inc., West Shore Trucking, Inc., filed by Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Louis Bisignano, Thomas Gesualdi, Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Denise Richardson, Marc Herbst, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. (Smith, Christopher)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B. Ziskin on behalf of S. Di Fazio and Sons Construction, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Ziskin, Richard)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DiFazio Industries, LLC, Faztec Industries, Inc., S. Di Fazio and Sons Construction, Inc., West Shore Trucking, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons DiFazio Industries, LLC, #2 Summons Faztec Industries, Inc., #3 Summons West Shore Trucking, Inc.) (Rodin, Deanna)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DiFazio Industries, LLC, Faztec Industries, Inc., John Doe Corporations 1 through 10, John and Jane Does 1 Through 100, Other John Doe Entities 1 Through 10, S. Di Fazio and Sons Construction, Inc. d/b/a DiFazio Environmental Services, West Shore Trucking, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11177427 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Louis Bisignano, Thomas Gesualdi, Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Denise Richardson, Marc Herbst, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons S. Di Fazio and Sons Construction, Inc. d/b/a DiFazio Environmental Services, #2 Proposed Summons DiFazio Industries, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Faztec Industries, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons West Shore Trucking, Inc., #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Smith, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gesualdi et al v. S. Di Fazio and Sons Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faztec Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Peter R. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Di Fazio and Sons Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. Ziskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other John Doe Entities 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Shore Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1 Through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DiFazio Industries, LLC
Represented By: Charles N. Internicola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Bisignano
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Bardavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank H. Finkel
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Bardavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bourgal
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Bardavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Richardson
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Bardavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Toole
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Bardavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Herbst
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Bardavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gesualdi
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Bardavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Corbett
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Bardavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Jeffers
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Bardavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr.
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Muller
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Bardavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?