Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Vacation Fund et al v. Regal Construction et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Flanagan, as Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Annuity Fund, Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Vacation Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Training Program, Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Welfare Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Laborers' Employer Cooperative and Educational Trust Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as Business Manager of General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 66 of the Laborers' International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Pension Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Greater NY Laborers' Employer Cooperative and Educational Trust Fund and Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers" Local 66 New York State Health and Safety Fund
Defendant: Rich Hall, Regal Construction a/k/a Regal Contracting Inc., Regal Construction and Regal Contracting Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00816
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Mailing Notice of Hearing by Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Vacation Fund, Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Welfare Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as Business Manager of General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 66 of the Laborers' International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Stephen Flanagan, as Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Annuity Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Greater NY Laborers' Employer Cooperative and Educational Trust Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Laborers' Employer Cooperative and Educational Trust Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Pension Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Training Program, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers" Local 66 New York State Health and Safety Fund (LaVelle, William)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Greater NY Laborers' Employer Cooperative and Educational Trust Fund, Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Welfare Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Training Program, Stephen Flanagan, as Business Manager of General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 66 of the Laborers' International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Pension Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers" Local 66 New York State Health and Safety Fund, Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Vacation Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Annuity Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Laborers' Employer Cooperative and Educational Trust Fund. Rich Hall served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (LaVelle, William)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Greater NY Laborers' Employer Cooperative and Educational Trust Fund, Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Welfare Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Training Program, Stephen Flanagan, as Business Manager of General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 66 of the Laborers' International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Pension Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers" Local 66 New York State Health and Safety Fund, Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Vacation Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Annuity Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Laborers' Employer Cooperative and Educational Trust Fund. Regal Construction served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (LaVelle, William)
February 13, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF. (Disbrow, Sandra)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rich Hall, Regal Construction. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11186426, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Greater NY Laborers' Employer Cooperative and Educational Trust Fund, Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Welfare Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Training Program, Stephen Flanagan, as Business Manager of General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 66 of the Laborers' International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Pension Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers" Local 66 New York State Health and Safety Fund, Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Vacation Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Annuity Fund, Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Laborers' Employer Cooperative and Educational Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (LaVelle, William) Modified on 2/12/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Vacation Fund et al v. Regal Construction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Flanagan, as Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Annuity Fund
Represented By: William Troy LaVelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Vacation Fund
Represented By: William Troy LaVelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Training Program
Represented By: William Troy LaVelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Flanagan as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Welfare Fund
Represented By: William Troy LaVelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Laborers' Employer Cooperative and Educational Trust Fund
Represented By: William Troy LaVelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Flanagan, as Business Manager of General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 66 of the Laborers' International Union of North America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: William Troy LaVelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Pension Fund
Represented By: William Troy LaVelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers' Local 66 Greater NY Laborers' Employer Cooperative and Educational Trust Fund
Represented By: William Troy LaVelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Flanagan, as a Trustee of the General Building Laborers" Local 66 New York State Health and Safety Fund
Represented By: William Troy LaVelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Construction a/k/a Regal Contracting Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Contracting Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?