Rembert v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Jerry Earl Rembert
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv00820
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Joseph F Bianco
1 Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Layaliza K. Soloveichik on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Soloveichik, Layaliza)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Florio, Lisa)
March 8, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly. Judge Joseph F. Bianco no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Copy of docket mailed to pro se plaintiff) (Florio, Lisa)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERED parties are directed to adhere to the policies set forth below. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 2/15/2019. (Bollbach, Jean)cm by chambers (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/25/2019) (Bollbach, Jean).
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Pro Se Dept to Jerry Rembert acknowledging receipt of the civil action. (Florio, Lisa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerry Earl Rembert. (Cox, Dwayne)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Jerry Earl Rembert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rembert v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Layaliza K. Soloveichik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Earl Rembert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?