Parabit Systems, Inc. v. Synergistics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Parabit Systems, Inc.
Defendant: IML Security, Synergistics, Inc., Marc Seidenberg, Island Master Locksmith Inc., Gregory I. Goldman, Millenium Group, Inc., Steven R. London, John Does I-III and Cathy T. Goldman
Case Number: 2:2019cv00888
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Brian M Cogan
2 Judge: Peggy Kuo
3 Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parabit Systems, Inc.. IML Security served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Rando, Robert)
April 9, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parabit Systems, Inc.. Island Master Locksmith Inc. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Rando, Robert)
April 9, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parabit Systems, Inc.. Marc Seidenberg served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Rando, Robert)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #31 Motion to Strike. The promotion conference is waived. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/8/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
April 5, 2019 Filing 31 Letter MOTION to Strike #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim or to deny the motion in its entirety by Parabit Systems, Inc.. (Rando, Robert)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Status Conference is set for 4/22/2019 at 5:00 PM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/5/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying in part #29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. That portion of the motion to dismiss challenging personal jurisdiction is denied. The motion is mainly focused on the adequacy of allegations of personal jurisdiction in the complaint, but plaintiff has no obligation under Rule 8 to plead any allegations pertaining to personal jurisdiction, and so a complaint cannot inadequately allege the basis for personal jurisdiction. To the extent defendants' motion challenges whether there are fact sufficient to support personal jurisdiction dehors the complaint, defendants have merely made allegations in their brief, but have submitted no affidavits or other evidence to support those statements. Although plaintiff has the burden of proving personal jurisdiction when it is properly challenged, defendants had the burden of going forward to show at least a colorable basis for challenging personal jurisdiction, and unsupported statements in a brief do not do that. With regard to the remainder of the motion, plaintiff may want to consider filing an amended complaint that satisfies those issues. There does appear to be a "lumping" of defendants problem, and other than describing that defendants' product achieves the same end function as plaintiff's, the Court, at least at this stage, is not sure what it is about defendants' product that constitutes infringement. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/5/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
April 4, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo by random assignment. Judge Joan M. Azrack, Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
April 3, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative for Failure to State a Claim by Cathy T. Goldman, Gregory I. Goldman, Millenium Group, Inc., Synergistics, Inc.. (Lecusay, Kathryn)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for defendants Cathy T. Goldman and Gregory I. Goldman to respond to the Complaint is extended to 4/3/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/21/2019. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
March 20, 2019 Filing 28 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Cathy T. Goldman, Gregory I. Goldman, Millenium Group, Inc., Synergistics, Inc.. (Lecusay, Kathryn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Lecusay on behalf of Cathy T. Goldman, Gregory I. Goldman, Millenium Group, Inc., Synergistics, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Lecusay, Kathryn)
March 14, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parabit Systems, Inc.. Cathy T. Goldman served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Rando, Robert)
March 14, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parabit Systems, Inc.. Gregory I. Goldman served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Rando, Robert)
March 14, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parabit Systems, Inc.. Millenium Group, Inc. served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Rando, Robert)
March 14, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parabit Systems, Inc.. Synergistics, Inc. served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Rando, Robert)
February 15, 2019 CASE REASSIGNED INTO PATENT PILOT PROGRAM. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to case (Corsini, Alexander)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order PATENT PILOT REASSIGNMENT ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case from the patent pilot wheel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/15/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to John Does I-III. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Marc Seidenberg. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Steven R. London. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Cathy T. Goldman. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Gregory I. Goldman. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to IML Security. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Island Master Locksmith Inc.. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Millenium Group, Inc.. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Synergistics, Inc.. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Parabit Systems, Inc. (Rando, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Parabit Systems, Inc. (Rando, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Parabit Systems, Inc. (Rando, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Parabit Systems, Inc. (Rando, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Parabit Systems, Inc. (Rando, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Parabit Systems, Inc. (Rando, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Parabit Systems, Inc. (Rando, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Parabit Systems, Inc. (Rando, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Parabit Systems, Inc. (Rando, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Rodin, Deanna)
February 14, 2019 This is a patent case and is eligible for the Patent Pilot Project. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 14, 2019 Proposed summonses are rejected; the summonses contain headers from another case; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses without the header using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11199885 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Parabit Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit C, #14 Report on Filing Patent Action) (Rando, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parabit Systems, Inc. v. Synergistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IML Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergistics, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Lecusay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Seidenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Master Locksmith Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory I. Goldman
Represented By: Kathryn Lecusay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millenium Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Lecusay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R. London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy T. Goldman
Represented By: Kathryn Lecusay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parabit Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Rando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?