Vazquez v. Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC et. al.

Plaintiff: Kaitlin Vazquez
Defendant: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC and Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00891
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (Credle, Rita)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron R Easley on behalf of Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Easley, Aaron)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received for E-filed Supreme Court Case Index No. 617811/2018. (Valle, Christine)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 2/14/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2019: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC, Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 617811/2018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11200149). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Siachos, Peter) Modified on 2/14/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez v. Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlin Vazquez
Represented By: Mitchell L. Pashkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
Represented By: Peter G. Siachos
Represented By: Aaron R Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontline Asset Strategies, LLC
Represented By: Peter G. Siachos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?