Hall et al v. Nassau County et al

Plaintiff: Reina Hernandez, Wayne J. Hall and Floridalma Portillo
Defendant: Nassau County, Does 1-25, Assessment Review Commission of Nassau County and Department of Assessment of Nassau County
Case Number: 2:2019cv00893
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 5/22/2019 @ 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/22/2019. (Caggiano, Diana)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' Answer due 4/17/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/15/2019. (Graham, Emily)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint by Assessment Review Commission of Nassau County, Department of Assessment of Nassau County, Nassau County. (Kretzing, Laurel)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Florio, Lisa)
March 8, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Judge Joseph F. Bianco, Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Florio, Lisa)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne J. Hall, Floridalma Portillo, Reina Hernandez. Assessment Review Commission of Nassau County served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Press, Ira)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne J. Hall, Floridalma Portillo, Reina Hernandez. Department of Assessment of Nassau County served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Press, Ira)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne J. Hall, Floridalma Portillo, Reina Hernandez. Nassau County served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Press, Ira)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Assessment Review Commission of Nassau County, Department of Assessment of Nassau County, Nassau County. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Assessment Review Commission of Nassau County, Department of Assessment of Nassau County, Does 1-25, Nassau County filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11200747, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Wayne J. Hall, Floridalma Portillo, Reina Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Press, Ira) Modified on 2/15/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Nassau County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County
Represented By: Laurel R. Kretzing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assessment Review Commission of Nassau County
Represented By: Laurel R. Kretzing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Assessment of Nassau County
Represented By: Laurel R. Kretzing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reina Hernandez
Represented By: Ira Michael Press
Represented By: David Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne J. Hall
Represented By: Ira Michael Press
Represented By: David Bishop
Represented By: Seth Matthew Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floridalma Portillo
Represented By: Ira Michael Press
Represented By: David Bishop
Represented By: Seth Matthew Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?