Leigh v. Osprey's Dominion Vineyards, Ltd.

Plaintiff: Clifford Leigh
Defendant: Osprey's Dominion Vineyards, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00899
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Clifford Leigh. (Dunne, Joseph)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Clifford Leigh by Osprey's Dominion Vineyards, Ltd.. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Osprey's Dominion Vineyards, Ltd. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Wengrovsky on behalf of Osprey's Dominion Vineyards, Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Wengrovsky, Todd)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifford Leigh. Osprey's Dominion Vineyards, Ltd. served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Dunne, Joseph)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Osprey's Dominion Vineyards, Ltd. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. C/M to Register of Copyrights. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Osprey's Dominion Vineyards, Ltd. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11201282 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Clifford Leigh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons as to Osprey's Dominion Vineyards, Ltd.) (Dunne, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leigh v. Osprey's Dominion Vineyards, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osprey's Dominion Vineyards, Ltd.
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Leigh
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Dunne
Represented By: Jonah A. Grossbardt
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?