Ackerson et. al. v. Northrop Grumman Corporation et. al.
Plaintiff: Mary McDonald, Iris Cales, Dana Seaman, Andrew Barten, Rita Aquina, Renee Gannon, John Carr, Mildred Tommasulo, Sarah Motto, Roxane Pandya, Scott Lutzer, Brian Reid, Frank Turrisi, Frank Verdone, Ariana Tantillo, Thomas Villani, Angelo V. Sottile, William Gladitsch, Theresa Caputo, Jessica McNally, Edyta Klimkiewicz, Lisa Sciarratta, Diane Hirsch, Damon Rivera, John Sharrocks, Michael O'Shea, Armand L. Cipullo, Lauri Henriques, Patricia D'Accolti, Sara Grandison, Josephine Ryan, Marie Martello, Neil Wegman, Nicholas Yaniro, Edward Boyce, Regina Kreuz, Bonnie Scence, Matthew Ferber, Robert Haley, Joseph Reid, Maria R. Ackerson, William Lavin, Maria Panno, Nicholas Sergio, Antonia Novak, Anthony Tommasulo, Kathleen McCarthy, Candace Lu, Clara Palumbo and Jude Brewer
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation and Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00942
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bianco
Referring Judge: Denis R Hurley
2 Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
3 Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Northrop Grumman Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation (Kaufman, Jessica)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Maria R. Ackerson, Rita Aquina, Andrew Barten, Edward Boyce, Jude Brewer, Iris Cales, Theresa Caputo, John Carr, Armand L. Cipullo, Patricia D'Accolti, Matthew Ferber, Renee Gannon, William Gladitsch, Sara Grandison, Robert Haley, Lauri Henriques, Diane Hirsch, Edyta Klimkiewicz, Regina Kreuz, William Lavin, Candace Lu, Scott Lutzer, Marie Martello, Kathleen McCarthy, Mary McDonald, Jessica McNally, Sarah Motto, Antonia Novak, Michael O'Shea, Clara Palumbo, Roxane Pandya, Maria Panno, Brian Reid, Joseph Reid, Damon Rivera, Josephine Ryan, Bonnie Scence, Lisa Sciarratta, Dana Seaman, Nicholas Sergio, John Sharrocks, Angelo V. Sottile, Ariana Tantillo, Anthony Tommasulo, Mildred Tommasulo, Frank Turrisi, Frank Verdone, Thomas Villani, Neil Wegman, Nicholas Yaniro (Factor, Lilia)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties are hereby directed to show cause in writing filed on or before July 19, 2019 why the above actions should not be consolidated for all purposes. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 6/20/2019. (Cubano, Jazmin)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay for all further proceedings. Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf, Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/20/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 21, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf. Judge Joseph F. Bianco no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Russo, Eric)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Miller on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Miller, Mark)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Leone on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Leone, Frank)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting DE #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/1/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/1/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by All Plaintiffs. (Factor, Lilia)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Northrop Grumman Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: February 4, 2019 Hearing Transcript Excerpts) (Kaufman, Jessica)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on DE #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court is in receipt of the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Miller. Before the Court can rule on this motion, the Court requires that the original certificate(s) of good standing be forwarded to Chambers for review. Counsel is therefore directed to mail the original certificate(s) to the attention of the Hon. A. Kathleen Tomlinson, 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, NY 11722. Once the Court has received the original certificate(s), it will rule on counsel's motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 2/22/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 2/22/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court is in receipt of the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Leone. Before the Court can rule on this motion, the Court requires that the original certificate(s) of good standing be forwarded to Chambers for review. Counsel is therefore directed to mail the original certificate(s) to the attention of the Hon. A. Kathleen Tomlinson, 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, NY 11722. Once the Court has received the original certificate(s), it will rule on counsel's motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 2/22/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 2/22/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11220880. by Northrop Grumman Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit) (Miller, Mark)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11220627. by Northrop Grumman Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Leone, Frank)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet in Case No. 19-cv-00942. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 2/19/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Letter Seeking Judicial Determination that Civil Cases Are Related Under Local Rule 50.3.1 by Northrop Grumman Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation (Kaufman, Jessica)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Northrop Grumman Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, Case Number 600558/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CNYEDC-11207134). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Esposito, Grant) Modified on 2/19/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ackerson et. al. v. Northrop Grumman Corporation et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary McDonald
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Cales
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Seaman
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Barten
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Aquina
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Gannon
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carr
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Tommasulo
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Motto
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxane Pandya
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Lutzer
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Reid
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Turrisi
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Verdone
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariana Tantillo
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Villani
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo V. Sottile
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gladitsch
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Caputo
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica McNally
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edyta Klimkiewicz
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Sciarratta
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Hirsch
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Rivera
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sharrocks
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Shea
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armand L. Cipullo
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauri Henriques
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia D'Accolti
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Grandison
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Ryan
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Martello
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Wegman
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Yaniro
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Boyce
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Kreuz
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Scence
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Ferber
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Haley
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Reid
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria R. Ackerson
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lavin
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Panno
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Sergio
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonia Novak
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Tommasulo
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen McCarthy
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Lu
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Palumbo
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jude Brewer
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Frank Leone
Represented By: Robert James Baehr
Represented By: Jessica Kaufman
Represented By: Katie Louise Viggiani
Represented By: Mark A. Miller
Represented By: Grant Joseph Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation
Represented By: Frank Leone
Represented By: Robert James Baehr
Represented By: Jessica Kaufman
Represented By: Katie Louise Viggiani
Represented By: Mark A. Miller
Represented By: Grant Joseph Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?