McDermott v. Kaizen Media Group LLC

Plaintiff: Matthew McDermott
Defendant: Kaizen Media Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00973
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court notes that, as Defendant recognizes, Defendant's time to Answer expired on March 14, over one month prior to the instant request for an extension. The Court requires further information as to the cause of the delay in requesting an extension of time to respond. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 4/19/2019. (Cento, Patrick)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Kaizen Media Group LLC. (Toro, Joan)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled to be held before the undersigned on 6/18/2019 is converted to a Hearing In Aid of Judgment and is advanced to 5/21/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 at the Central Islip Courthouse. Plaintiff shall serve and file a motion for a default judgment by no later than 5/3/2019, and shall serve a copy of this Order upon defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 4/3/2019. c/ECF (Adell, April)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew McDermott. Kaizen Media Group LLC served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 20, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Federal Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kaizen Media Group LLC. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. C/M to Register of Copyrights. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kaizen Media Group LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11208664 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Matthew McDermott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDermott v. Kaizen Media Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew McDermott
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaizen Media Group LLC
Represented By: Joan Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?