Lanzillo v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Lucia Lanzillo
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv01068
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M. Dickman on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (aty to be noticed) (Dickman, Mary)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucia Lanzillo. Nancy Berryhill served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Delott, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons-US Attorney, #2 Summons-US Attorney General) (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint by Lucia Lanzillo (Delott, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2019 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint and Exhibit) initially filed as against Plaintiff. Re-entered Document Entry No. 1 as against Defendant. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 22, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number ANYEDC-11223497 (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Lucia Lanzillo. (Flanagan, Doreen) Modified on 2/22/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2019: #1 Exhibit) (Flanagan, Doreen).
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint by Lucia Lanzillo (Delott, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint by Lucia Lanzillo (Delott, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint by Lucia Lanzillo (Delott, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Lucia Lanzillo (Delott, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanzillo v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Mary M. Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Lanzillo
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Delott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?