United States of America v. Thirty-Eight Thousand Three Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($38,330.00)
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Thirty-Eight Thousand Three Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($38,330.00)
Case Number: 2:2019cv01132
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bianco
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Seizure Warrant Returned Executed. Served on 3/26/19. (Guzzi, Roseann)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 WARRANT for Arrest of Articles In Rem. So Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 3/14/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
March 8, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross. Judge Joseph F. Bianco no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Florio, Lisa)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thirty-Eight Thousand Three Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($38,330.00) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Thirty-Eight Thousand Three Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($38,330.00)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thirty-Eight Thousand Three Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($38,330.00)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert W. Schumacher, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?