Blowe v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Cecil B. Blowe
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv02658
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dara A Olds on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (aty to be noticed) (Olds, Dara)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff filed the complaint on 5/6/2019. The parties are directed to adhere to the following policies, based on E.D.N.Y. Administrative Order 2015-5 (Amon, Chief Judge), for expediting the disposition of Social Security cases; SEE ATTACHED ORDER. SO Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 5/9/2019. (Cubano, Jazmin)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11451571 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes,, filed by Cecil B. Blowe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (DeHaan, John) Modified on 5/7/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blowe v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil B. Blowe
Represented By: John W. DeHaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Dara A Olds
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?