Vuolo v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Plaintiff: Cody J. Vuolo
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02704
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
2 Judge: Edward R Korman
3 Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Cases associated. (Vertus, Miriam)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion to Adjourn 6/19/2019 Conference. Initial Conference rescheduled for 7/31/2019 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/12/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion to Consolidate Cases 2:19-cv-02698 (LHD)(SMG) with 2: 19-cv-02704 (ERK)(RER). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/12/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Cody J. Vuolo. (Lauriello, Valerie)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The 7/31/2019 Initial Conference previously scheduled before Judge Gold is rescheduled for 6/19/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 6/14/2019. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/10/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward R. Korman and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall, Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/10/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases; filed by Cody J. Vuolo. (Lauriello, Valerie) Modified. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:00 a.m. on July 31, 2019 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1(a) Disclosure) (Blumenschein, William)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cody J. Vuolo. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Lauriello, Valerie)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11458172, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Cody J. Vuolo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lauriello, Valerie) Modified on 5/8/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vuolo v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: William J. Blumenschein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody J. Vuolo
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?