The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. DiMuzio et al

Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Amanda DiMuzio, A.G.D., a minor, J.A.D., a minor, Faith DiMuzio, A.G.D. and J.A.D.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02879
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America re #13 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (30 days) Proof of Service of Text Order (Connolly, Deirdre)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: the Court is granting Defendants' motion for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by July 22, 2019. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Defendants forthwith and to file proof of service on ECF by June 21, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/19/2019. (Cento, Patrick)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change Firm, Address, and Email (Gerace, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (30 days) by Faith DiMuzio. (Cubano, Jazmin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against Faith DiMuzio by Amanda DiMuzio. (Gerace, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Gerace on behalf of Amanda DiMuzio (aty to be noticed) (Gerace, Christopher)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for August 9, 2019 at 11 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/7/2019. (Cento, Patrick)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. J.A.D. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Connolly, Deirdre)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. A.G.D. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Connolly, Deirdre)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Faith DiMuzio served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Connolly, Deirdre)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Amanda DiMuzio served on 5/25/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Connolly, Deirdre)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Faith DiMuzio, #2 Summons A.G.D., #3 Summons J.A.D.) (Rodin, Deanna)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Prudential Insurance Company of America for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Connolly, Deirdre)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against A.G.D., Amanda DiMuzio, Faith DiMuzio, J.A.D., filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11482167, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons as to Amanda DiMuzio, #9 Proposed Summons as to Faith DiMuzio, #10 Proposed Summons as to A.G.D., a minor, #11 Proposed Summons as to J.A.D., a minor) (Connolly, Deirdre) Modified on 5/16/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. DiMuzio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda DiMuzio
Represented By: Christopher Gerace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.G.D., a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A.D., a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith DiMuzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.G.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Deirdre Ann Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?