Davidson v. The Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Brian Davidson
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02972
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04205. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMARY ORDER: For the reasons stated above, this case is transferred to the Eastern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of New York without delay. Plaintiff is directed to serve this order on Defendant, and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/20/2019) (anc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/20/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court is inclined to transfer this case to the Eastern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). See id. ("The district court of a district in which is filed a case laying venue in the wrong division or district shall dismiss, or if it be in the interest of justice, transfer such case to any district or division in which it could have been brought."). Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE no later than May 17, 2019 as to why this action should not be transferred to the Eastern District of New York. In the alternative, if Plaintiff is willing to transfer this action to the Eastern District of New York, the Court requests that he submit a letter to the Court stating that he consents to the transfer of this action to the Eastern District of New York by May 17, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/14/2019) (anc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/20/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Long Island Railroad Company. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/20/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/20/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/20/2019.]
May 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/20/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brian Davidson. (Gold, Fredric) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/20/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gold, Fredric) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/20/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16852166)Document filed by Brian Davidson.(Gold, Fredric) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. The Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Davidson
Represented By: Fredric M. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?