Scotto et. al. v. Monsanto Company

Plaintiff: Ellen D. Scotto
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv03004
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 CASE: 2:19-cv-03004 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-03299, filed 06/11/2019. (Marziliano, August)
June 7, 2019 Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-(135)- Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. (Marziliano, August)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-(135)- Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Marziliano, August)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 135) IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2741. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Ortiz, Grisel)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on June 26, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Defense counsel is directed to ensure that plaintiff's counsel is aware of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia)
May 22, 2019 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. Attorney Craig M. Silverman if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Rothman, Alan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monsanto Company re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Rothman, Alan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Rothman, Alan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monsanto Company from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, Case Number 604661/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11500475). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint) (Rothman, Alan) Modified on 5/22/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scotto et. al. v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen D. Scotto
Represented By: Craig M. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Alan E. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?