Mingo et al v. Optum360 Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christian Sims, Onique Morris and Malik Mingo
Defendant: Lisa Rodriguez, OPTUM 360, LLC, Kelvin Iglesias, OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC., Lisa Perry, UNITED HEALTH WORLD GROUP, INC., NORTHWELL HEALTH, INC., NORTHWELL HEALTHCARE, INC., Michelle Puelo and Michelle Puleo
Case Number: 2:2019cv03083
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to withdraw #18 is granted. Attorney Yusha D. Hiraman is hereby terminated from the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 7/21/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney /Withdrawal of Appearance of Yusha D. Hiraman by Malik Mingo, Onique Morris, Christian Sims. (Filippatos, Parisis)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:30 A.M. on 8/23/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time that Defendant makes an appearance in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 8/23/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/19/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Michelle Puleo waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Kelvin Iglesias waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Lisa Perry waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Lisa Rodriguez waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Northwell Healthcare, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Northwell Health, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. United Health World Group, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Optum 360, LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Optum360 Services, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kelvin Iglesias, Northwell Health, Inc., Northwell Healthcare, Inc., Optum 360, LLC, Optum360 Services, Inc., Lisa Perry, Michelle Puleo, Lisa Rodriguez, United Health World Group, Inc.. (Almonte, Giselle)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Yusha D. Hiraman on behalf of Malik Mingo, Onique Morris, Christian Sims (aty to be noticed) (Hiraman, Yusha)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica R. Sanders on behalf of Malik Mingo, Onique Morris, Christian Sims (aty to be noticed) (Sanders, Erica)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information., by Malik Mingo, Onique Morris, Christian Sims (Filippatos, Parisis)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 24, 2019 Proposed summons is rejected; the caption on the summons does not match the caption of the complaint; specifically, if you use "et al" you must attach a rider with the full caption; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit a completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 24, 2019 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Defendants were added to the case incorrectly; docket entry 1 was deleted and re-entered against corrected defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 23, 2019 FILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11510203 (Rodin, Deanna)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Rodin, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mingo et al v. Optum360 Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM 360, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelvin Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTH WORLD GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHWELL HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHWELL HEALTHCARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Puelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Puleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Sims
Represented By: Parisis G. Filippatos
Represented By: Erica R. Sanders
Represented By: Yusha D. Hiraman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onique Morris
Represented By: Parisis G. Filippatos
Represented By: Erica R. Sanders
Represented By: Yusha D. Hiraman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Mingo
Represented By: Parisis G. Filippatos
Represented By: Erica R. Sanders
Represented By: Yusha D. Hiraman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?