Haddock v. Nassau County Court et al
Plaintiff: John Haddock
Defendant: Nassau County Court, Nassau County Sheriffs Department, Nassau County Police and Nassau County Police Department
Case Number: 2:2019cv03227
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for More Definite Statement /for the Court to order pltff's release, filed by John Haddock. (Galeano, Sonia)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Letter dated 7/9/2019 to Judge Cheryl L. Pollak from John Haddock, Pro Se. (Galeano, Sonia) Modified descriptive text. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Letter dated 7/8/19 from Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of the Court to Warden or Superintendent re: John Haddock. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (as amended July 26, 1996), plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis and must pay the tolal $350 fee by monthly installments deducted from plaintiffs prison trust fund account (or institutional equivalent). (Galeano, Sonia)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge, filed by John Haddock. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibits) (Galeano, Sonia)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Letter dated 5/29/19 from John Haddock to Pro Se Office, informing the Court that deft "was never sentenced under no sex laws of New York State." Deft seeks to inquire "how he can bring a crime charge against Nassau County Court and request the assistance of the Pro Se Office to attack crime case." Deft request to obtain "a booklet with information re: Social Security benefits for inmate with back payment of imprisonment." (Galeano, Sonia)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Pro Se Dept. to John Haddock dated May 31, 2019 acknowledging receipt to the civil action. (Cubano, Jazmin)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Doudalis, Evelyn) Modified on 6/6/2019 (Doudalis, Evelyn).
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Haddock. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by John Haddock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Doudalis, Evelyn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2019: #2 Attachment 1) (Doudalis, Evelyn). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/31/2019) (Doudalis, Evelyn). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/31/2019) (Doudalis, Evelyn). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/31/2019) (Doudalis, Evelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haddock v. Nassau County Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Haddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?