Ventura v. Durham et al
Plaintiff: Roberto Sarrios Ventura and Roberto V. Sarrios
Defendant: United States District Court and John Durham
Case Number: 2:2019cv03303
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this complaint, filed in forma pauperis, is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) and 1915(e)(2)(B); that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) any appeal would not be taken in good faith; that in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal; See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962); that the judgment is hereby entered; and that the case is close.Ordered by Tiffany Campbell, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 6/14/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: The Court grants Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis #2 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Accordingly, the complaint, filed in forma pauperis, is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)and 1915(e)(2)(B). The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and close this case. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/13/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to Warden or Superintendent from Douglas C. Palmer re the Prisoner Authorization that requests and authorizes the agency to send a certified copy of plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months to the Court. The prisoner authorization further requests and authorizes your agency to calculate the amounts specified by 28 U.S.C. 1915, to deduct those amounts from plaintiff's prison trust fund account (or institutional equivalent) and to disburse those amounts to this Court. (See letter for details) (Tavarez, Jennifer)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Pro Se Dept to Roberto Sarrios Ventura acknowledging receipt of civil action. (Florio, Lisa)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Doudalis, Evelyn) Modified on 6/4/2019 (Doudalis, Evelyn). Modified on 6/4/2019 (Doudalis, Evelyn).
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Authorization (Doudalis, Evelyn) Modified on 6/4/2019 (Doudalis, Evelyn).
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roberto Sarrios Ventura. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Roberto Sarrios Ventura. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Doudalis, Evelyn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2019: #2 Letter) (Doudalis, Evelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ventura v. Durham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Sarrios Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto V. Sarrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?