Allstate Insurance Company v. D'Arienzo et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Gregorio Parades Mendez, Steven D'Arienzo, Michael E. Biddlecomb, Taylor D'Arienzo, Donna D'Arienzo and Marisol LaFontaine Capraro
Case Number: 2:2019cv03319
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 8/22/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/22/2019. (Caggiano, Diana)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Michael E. Biddlecomb served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Berberich, Karen)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Gregorio Parades Mendez served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Berberich, Karen)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Steven D'Arienzo served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Berberich, Karen)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Donna D'Arienzo served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Berberich, Karen)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Marisol LaFontaine Capraro served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Berberich, Karen)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Taylor D'Arienzo served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Berberich, Karen)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael E. Biddlecomb, Marisol LaFontaine Capraro, Donna D'Arienzo, Steven D'Arienzo, Taylor D'Arienzo, Gregorio Parades Mendez filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11544624 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Berberich, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. D'Arienzo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregorio Parades Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D'Arienzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Biddlecomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor D'Arienzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna D'Arienzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisol LaFontaine Capraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Karen Maria Berberich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?