Mahoney v. United Cerebral Palsy Association of Long Island et al
Plaintiff: Maureen Mahoney
Defendant: Janine Klein, United Cerebral Palsy Association of Long Island and Mark Crean
Case Number: 2:2019cv03356
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- The motion is granted; attorney Marielle A. Moore terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/29/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Maureen Mahoney. (Moore, Marielle)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, August 20, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than August 16, 2019, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/24/2019. (Guy, Alicia)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United Cerebral Palsy Association of Long Island. (Domanick, Timothy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by United Cerebral Palsy Association of Long Island. (Domanick, Timothy)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, It is hereby stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiff, Maureen Mahoney, and Defendants Mark Crean and Janine Klein, that the above-entitled action shall be dismissed with prejudice (against these named defendants only) and without costs or attorneys' fees to any party as against the other. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/8/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Mark Crean, Janine Klein, United Cerebral Palsy Association of Long Island (Domanick, Timothy)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent; the defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by July 19, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/27/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Mark Crean, Janine Klein, United Cerebral Palsy Association of Long Island. (Domanick, Timothy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Mancher on behalf of Mark Crean, Janine Klein, United Cerebral Palsy Association of Long Island (aty to be noticed) (Mancher, Mark)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy James Domanick on behalf of Mark Crean, Janine Klein, United Cerebral Palsy Association of Long Island (aty to be noticed) (Domanick, Timothy)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mark Crean, Janine Klein, United Cerebral Palsy Association of Long Island. (Attachments: #1 Summons Janine Klein, #2 Summons Mark Crean) (Rodin, Deanna)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marielle Alecia Moore on behalf of Maureen Mahoney (aty to be noticed) (Moore, Marielle)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Crean, Janine Klein, United Cerebral Palsy Association of Long Island filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11549813, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Maureen Mahoney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Menken, Bruce) Modified on 6/7/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahoney v. United Cerebral Palsy Association of Long Island et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janine Klein
Represented By: Mark S. Mancher
Represented By: Timothy James Domanick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Cerebral Palsy Association of Long Island
Represented By: Mark S. Mancher
Represented By: Timothy James Domanick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Crean
Represented By: Mark S. Mancher
Represented By: Timothy James Domanick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Mahoney
Represented By: Marielle Alecia Moore
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?