Mayrose et. al. v. The County of Suffolk et. al.
Plaintiff: Maria Mayrose and The Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency
Defendant: Alan Wolinsky, The County of Suffolk and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv03396
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Mayrose. The County of Suffolk served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Lockwood, Scott)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Mayrose. The Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Lockwood, Scott)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Mayrose. Alan Wolinsky served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Lockwood, Scott)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: John Does 1-10 answer due 8/16/2019; The County of Suffolk answer due 8/16/2019; The Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency answer due 8/16/2019; Alan Wolinsky answer due 8/16/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 7/17/2019. (Minerva, Deanna)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or respond to complaint by John Does 1-10, The County of Suffolk, The Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency, Alan Wolinsky. (Schirmer, Drew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew W. Schirmer on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Schirmer, Drew)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF. (Disbrow, Sandra)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to The County of Suffolk, The Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency, Alan Wolinsky. (Tirado, Chelsea)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information., by Maria Mayrose (Lockwood, Scott)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 12, 2019 Proposed summons is rejected; the section that reads "The answer or motion must be served on plaintiff or plaintiff's attorney, whose name and address are:" has not been completed; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons. Counsel is advised to submit a completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 12, 2019 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Defendant John Does 1-10 were missing from the case. Added Defendant John Does 1-10. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint) and re-entered as against all Defendant. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint, Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information., #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Maria Mayrose (Lockwood, Scott)
June 11, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a correct Civil Cover Sheet. The Civil Cover Sheet in Document Entry No. 2 appears to be for a different case. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Maria Mayrose (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Lockwood, Scott)
June 10, 2019 A Civil Cover Sheet was not filed; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 7, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number ANYEDC-11554501 (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Maria Mayrose. (Flanagan, Doreen) Modified on 6/12/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayrose et. al. v. The County of Suffolk et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Wolinsky
Represented By: Drew W. Schirmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Suffolk
Represented By: Drew W. Schirmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Represented By: Drew W. Schirmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Mayrose
Represented By: Scott Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?