Bleckner v. Gilman
Plaintiff: Ross Bleckner
Defendant: Cody Gilman
Case Number: 2:2019cv03406
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Denis R Hurley
2 Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
3 Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Civil Case Terminated; Case closed. (Cubano, Jazmin)
July 24, 2019 Cases associated with 18cv6532. Case Consolidated. (Cubano, Jazmin)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #29 Motion to Consolidate Cases: At the request of both parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is consolidated for all purposes with civil action No. 18-6532. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate these matters under case no. 18-cv-6852 and to close case no. 19-cv-3406. All filings should be made in action no. 18-cv-6532. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a pre-motion conference will be held in this matter via telephone on August 14, 2019 at 11:30 am. Counsel for Gilman will initiate the call and all counsel should be on the line before calling chambers at 631-712-5650. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 7/24/2019. (Gapinski, Michele)
June 21, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 Letter MOTION to Consolidate Cases and For A Pre-Motion Conference filed by Ross Bleckner. (Valentino, James)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for January 28, 2020 at :30 PM before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 6/19/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay conference held on 6/19/2019. In light of the common parties and issues, the scheduling order in this matter is amended to correspond with the discovery schedule in 18 CV 6532 (DRH). c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Filing 29 Letter MOTION to Consolidate Cases and For A Pre-Motion Conference by Cody Gilman. (Mesidor, Marjorie)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of 6/10/2019 Order, the initial conference before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon is adjourned sine die. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/11/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay for all further proceedings. Judge Frederic Block, Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/10/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant's letter application #28 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. This case will be re-assigned to J. Hurley and MJ Lindsay as related to: Gilman v. Bleckner, CV-18-6532. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 6/10/2019. (Innelli, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 28 First MOTION to Reassign Case to Central Islip courthouse by Cody Gilman. (Kirschenbaum, Gregory)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 7/17/2019 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 7/11/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/10/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
June 7, 2019 Filing 26 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
June 7, 2019 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-10840. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 30, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: THEREFORE, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to close the case. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 5/30/2019) (rro) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
May 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #23 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Cody Gilman. (Mesidor, Marjorie) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Marjorie Mesidor dated May 24, 2019 re: Letter. Document filed by Cody Gilman.(Mesidor, Marjorie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
May 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Marjorie Mesidor to RE-FILE Document No. #21 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the proposed order is not correct; Re-file the Letter first under Other Documents, as a Letter, then separately file the Order under Proposed Orders, as a Proposed Order. (dt) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Cody Gilman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Transfer to EDNY) (Mesidor, Marjorie) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 5/24/2019 (dt). [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter filed by Ross Bleckner. ENDORSEMENT: DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 5/1/2019) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 19 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Gregory W. Kirschenbaum, Esq. dated April 17, 2019 re: Defendant's opposition to Plaintiff's request that the April 16, 2019 Order be reconsidered. Document filed by Cody Gilman.(Kirschenbaum, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 18 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from James F. Valentino dated 04.17.19 re: Order dated April 16, 2019. Document filed by Ross Bleckner.(Valentino, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #16 Letter filed by Cody Gilman. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's Motion to Transfer to the Eastern District of New York is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 4/16/2019) (anc) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Gregory W. Kirschenbaum, Esq. dated April 4, 2019 re: Defendant's December 5, 2018 and January 4, 2019 requests. Document filed by Cody Gilman.(Kirschenbaum, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Plaintiff dated January 7, 2019 re: Defendant's Letter Motion for conference (Docket No. 14). Document filed by Ross Bleckner.(Hinkle, Ramsey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Marjorie Mesidor, Esq. dated January 4, 2019. Document filed by Cody Gilman.(Mesidor, Marjorie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Cody Gilman.(Mesidor, Marjorie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cody Gilman.(Mesidor, Marjorie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Marjorie Mesidor, Esq. dated December 21, 2018 re: Request for Status Update on Defendant's Request for Extension of Time to Answer (Dkt. No. 10). Document filed by Cody Gilman.(Mesidor, Marjorie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Marjorie Mesidor, Esq. dated December 5, 2018. Document filed by Cody Gilman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mesidor, Marjorie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from James F. Valentino dated 12/5/18 re: Change of Venue of Related Case. Document filed by Ross Bleckner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Judge Hurley dated 12.05.2018)(Valentino, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Francis Valentino on behalf of Ross Bleckner. (Valentino, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory William Kirschenbaum on behalf of Cody Gilman. (Kirschenbaum, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Cody Gilman on 11/21/2018. Service was accepted by Selphie Keller. Document filed by Ross Bleckner. (Hinkle, Ramsey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ramsey Hinkle on behalf of Ross Bleckner. (Hinkle, Ramsey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 160633/2018..Document filed by Cody Gilman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint)(Mesidor, Marjorie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
November 20, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
November 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marjorie Mesidor. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
November 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Marjorie Mesidor to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits to pleading must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet (Dkt. 1 - 2) served on Plaintiff Ross Bleckner on November 19, 2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Cody Gilman. (Mesidor, Marjorie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mesidor, Marjorie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 160633/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15936629).Document filed by Cody Gilman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mesidor, Marjorie) Modified on 11/20/2018 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bleckner v. Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Gilman
Represented By: Marjorie Mesidor
Represented By: Gregory William Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Gregory W. Kirschenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Bleckner
Represented By: James Francis Valentino
Represented By: Ramsey Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?