Sethi v. Quality Health Plans of New York, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harsharan Sethi
Defendant: QHP Financial Group Inc., Dr. Richard Bonano, Safia Khan, Sabiha Khan, Azima Bano, Richard Clark, Quality Health Plans of New York, Inc., Nazeer Khan, Dr. Haider Ali Khan and Arain Nawaz
Case Number: 2:2019cv03499
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #13 Letter to Hon. Margo K. Brodie re: proposed briefing schedule. The Court adopts Defendants' proposed briefing schedule. Defendants shall serve their motion on or before September 13, 2019; Plaintiff shall serve his opposition on or before October 28, 2019; Defendants shall serve and file their reply, if any, on or before November 11, 2019. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/2/2019. (Beeney, Eliza)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 Letter to Hon. Margo K. Brodie re: proposed briefing schedule by Azima Bano, Richard Bonano, Richard Clark, Haider Ali Khan, Nazeer Khan, Sabiha Khan, Safia Khan, Arain Nawaz, QHP Financial Group Inc., Quality Health Plans of New York, Inc. (Stiller, Sharon)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court denies Defendants' request for a pre motion conference. Defendants are directed to propose a briefing schedule for their anticipated motion. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/30/2019. (Beeney, Eliza)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 Letter dated July 23, 2019 from Harsharan Sethi to Judge Brodie, advising that plaintiff did not respond to defendant's motion for pre-motion conference, because plaintiff did not receive the motion. (Piper, Francine)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #9 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference. Plaintiff is directed to respond to Defendants' motion on or before July 25, 2019 in a submission not exceeding three pages. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/11/2019. (Beeney, Eliza)
July 11, 2019 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Fernandez, Erica)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification by Harsharan Sethi (Fernandez, Erica)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for Production and Inspection of Documents by Harsharan Sethi. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope) (Piper, Francine)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Azima Bano, Richard Bonano, Richard Clark, Haider Ali Khan, Nazeer Khan, Sabiha Khan, Safia Khan, Arain Nawaz, QHP Financial Group Inc., Quality Health Plans of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Stiller, Sharon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Didora on behalf of Azima Bano, Richard Bonano, Richard Clark, Haider Ali Khan, Nazeer Khan, Sabiha Khan, Safia Khan, Arain Nawaz, QHP Financial Group Inc., Quality Health Plans of New York, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Didora, Matthew)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon P. Stiller on behalf of Azima Bano, Richard Bonano, Richard Clark, Haider Ali Khan, Nazeer Khan, Sabiha Khan, Safia Khan, Arain Nawaz, QHP Financial Group Inc., Quality Health Plans of New York, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Stiller, Sharon)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harsharan Sethi. Azima Bano served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Richard Bonano served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Richard Clark served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Haider Ali Khan served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Nazeer Khan served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Sabiha Khan served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Safia Khan served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Arain Nawaz served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; QHP Financial Group Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Quality Health Plans of New York, Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (Piper, Francine)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Pro Se Dept to Harsharan Sethi acknowledging receipt of civil action. (Florio, Lisa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Related Cases: 11-cv-2511-MKB-ARL, 11-cv-3941-JFB-ETB and 11-cv-6380-SJF-GRB (Cox, Dwayne)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
June 13, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 27904 (Cox, Dwayne)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Cox, Dwayne)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Harsharan Sethi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sethi v. Quality Health Plans of New York, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QHP Financial Group Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Didora
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Bonano
Represented By: Matthew Didora
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safia Khan
Represented By: Matthew Didora
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabiha Khan
Represented By: Matthew Didora
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azima Bano
Represented By: Matthew Didora
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Clark
Represented By: Matthew Didora
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Health Plans of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Didora
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nazeer Khan
Represented By: Matthew Didora
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Haider Ali Khan
Represented By: Matthew Didora
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arain Nawaz
Represented By: Matthew Didora
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harsharan Sethi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?