Raynor Group v. YRC Inc.
Plaintiff: RAYNOR GROUP d/b/a RAYNOR MARKETING, LTD and Raynor Group
Defendant: YRC INC d/b/a YRC FREIGHT and YRC Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03661
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #7 Motion for Pre Motion Conference with leave to renew. Defendant may not file a motion to dismiss at this time. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by September 9, 2019. Thereafter, should defendant wish to move to dismiss the amended complaint, it may renew its application for a pre motion conference before the Court. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/16/2019. (Gallagher, Erin)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Raynor Group. (Scharaga, Ira)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: On June 28, 2019, defendant filed a letter requesting a pre-motion conference concerning a proposed motion to dismiss. The Court's individual rules require parties to respond to pre-motion conference letters within seven days. Plaintiff has not filed any response to this letter. Plaintiff must file a response to the letter by August 9, 2019. Failure to respond may result in the dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/31/2019. (Gallagher, Erin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for Pre Motion Conference to Judge Azrack by YRC Inc. (Martin, Thomas) Modified event type from Letter to Motion on 7/8/2019 (Ortiz, Grisel).
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Bierman on behalf of YRC Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bierman, William) Modified on 6/25/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Christopher Martin on behalf of YRC Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Martin, Thomas) Modified on 6/25/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by YRC Inc. identifying Corporate Parent YRC Worldwide, Inc. for YRC Inc. (Martin, Thomas) Modified on 6/25/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by YRC Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, Case Number 605918-2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11602312). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Martin, Thomas) Modified on 6/25/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raynor Group v. YRC Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC INC d/b/a YRC FREIGHT
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Martin
Represented By: William D. Bierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Martin
Represented By: William D. Bierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYNOR GROUP d/b/a RAYNOR MARKETING, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raynor Group
Represented By: Ira M. Scharaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?