The Halo Group, Inc. et. al. v. Brodsky et. al.
Plaintiff: The Halo Group, Inc. and Linda Passante
Defendant: David Pasternack, Bert E. Brodsky, Kevin Lee and Mark Simon
Case Number: 2:2019cv03664
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The parties' #9 joint proposed briefing schedule is So Ordered. The Court sets the following deadlines: (1) Defendants shall serve their motion and memorandum of law in support by August 30, 2019; (2) Plaintiffs shall serve their brief in opposition and cross-motions, if any, by September 30, 2019; (3) Defendants may serve their reply brief, if any, by October 18, 2019; and (4) Plaintiffs may serve their reply brief, if any, by November 1, 2019. As a courtesy to the Court, the parties are encouraged to not file their motion papers until the motion is fully briefed. If the parties follow this practice, the notice of motion and all supporting papers are to be served on the other parties along with a cover letter setting forth whom the movant represents and the papers being served. Only a copy of the cover letter should be filed electronically, as a letter, not as a motion. On the day the motion is fully briefed, in this case on November 1, 2019, each party shall electronically file its moving papers. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/31/2019. (Brodziak, Maya)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Scheduling Order by Bert E. Brodsky, Kevin Lee, David Pasternack, Mark Simon (Ryan, James)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court denies as unnecessary Defendants' #7 request for a pre-motion conference. The Court grants Defendants leave to file their anticipated motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs may include their proposed motions as part of their responsive briefing. The parties shall confer and submit a proposed joint briefing schedule to the Court by July 31, 2019. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/24/2019. (Brodziak, Maya)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Letter IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' LETTER OF JULY 17, 2019 by The Halo Group, Inc. (Schrier, Richard)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Bert E. Brodsky, Kevin Lee, David Pasternack, Mark Simon. (Ryan, James)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Given Plaintiffs' #6 Amended Complaint, Defendants shall advise the Court, by July 17, 2019, in a letter not exceeding three (3) pages, whether it still seeks to move for dismissal of the Amended Complaint and on what grounds. Plaintiffs shall respond to any renewed premotion conference request, in a letter not to exceed three (3) pages, by July 24, 2019. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/10/2019. (Brodziak, Maya)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The Halo Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Schrier, Richard)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Bert E. Brodsky, Kevin Lee, David Pasternack, Mark Simon. (Ryan, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Ryan on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service) (Ryan, James)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Davis, Kimberly) Modified on 6/26/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2019: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bert E. Brodsky, Kevin Lee, David Pasternack, Mark Simon from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, Case Number 604758/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11602660). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - No. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Stipulation Accepting Service an Time to Extend to Answer, #4 Exhibit C - Supreme Notice to Filing Notice of Removal) (McLaughlin, Jennifer) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/26/2019) (Davis, Kimberly). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/26/2019) (Davis, Kimberly). Modified on 6/26/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Halo Group, Inc. et. al. v. Brodsky et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pasternack
Represented By: Jennifer A. McLaughlin
Represented By: James G. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert E. Brodsky
Represented By: Jennifer A. McLaughlin
Represented By: James G. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Lee
Represented By: Jennifer A. McLaughlin
Represented By: James G. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Simon
Represented By: Jennifer A. McLaughlin
Represented By: James G. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Halo Group, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Schrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Passante
Represented By: Richard Schrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?