Black Diamond Site Development, LLC. v. Regiment Construction Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Black Diamond Site Development, LLC and Black Diamond Site Development, LLC.
Defendant: Regiment Construction Corp. and International Fidelity Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv03817
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Gary R Brown
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Black Diamond Site Development, LLC.. International Fidelity Insurance Company waiver sent on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (McCabe, Edward)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Black Diamond Site Development, LLC.. Regiment Construction Corp. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McCabe, Edward)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to International Fidelity Insurance Company, Regiment Construction Corp. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 3, 2019 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Complaint was filed as against plaintiff. Entry was deleted and refiled as against defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet Re #1 Complaint by Black Diamond Site Development, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (McCabe, Edward)
July 3, 2019 Notice: Re: Missing Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet - found under Other Documents. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 1, 2019 FILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11624688 (Rodin, Deanna)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Fidelity Insurance Company, Regiment Construction Corp. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Black Diamond Site Development, LLC. (Rodin, Deanna) Modified on 7/3/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black Diamond Site Development, LLC. v. Regiment Construction Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Diamond Site Development, LLC
Represented By: Edward Gerard McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Diamond Site Development, LLC.
Represented By: Edward Gerard McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regiment Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Fidelity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?