The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development v. Andrew et al
Plaintiff: THE SECRETARY OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, an agency of the UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, and The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Defendant: County Of Nassau, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Leonard K. Andrew, as Executor of the Estate of Catherine Andrew a/k/a Catherine B. Andrew a/k/a Catherine Benjamin Andrew, deceased;, Jerome Andrew aka Jerome A. Andrew;, Arrow Financial Services LLC, GE Money Bank, JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5, said names being fictitious, it being the intention of plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or clai, Jerome Andrew, Jerome A. Andrew, Leonard K. Andrew and John Doe #1-5 and Jane Doe #1-5
Case Number: 2:2019cv03831
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Gary R Brown
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. John Doe #1-5 and Jane Doe #1-5 served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Manfredi, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Leonard K. Andrew. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Main Document 13 replaced on 8/16/2019) (Ortiz, Grisel).
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Jerome Andrew served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Manfredi, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Leonard K. Andrew served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Manfredi, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. GE Money Bank served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Manfredi, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Arrow Financial Services LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Manfredi, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. New York State Department of Taxation and Finance served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Manfredi, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. County Of Nassau served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Manfredi, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jerome Andrew, Leonard K. Andrew, Arrow Financial Services LLC, County Of Nassau, GE Money Bank, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance. (Ortiz, Grisel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Attachments: #1 proposed summons, #2 proposed summons, #3 proposed summons, #4 proposed summons, #5 proposed summons) (Manfredi, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 3, 2019 Proposed summonses are rejected; the form that is on the Court's website is to be utilized; Counsel is advised to submit corrected proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 3, 2019 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Complaint in docket entry 1 was filed as against only two of the defendants. Entry was deleted and refiled as against all defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons) (Rodin, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development v. Andrew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Nassau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard K. Andrew, as Executor of the Estate of Catherine Andrew a/k/a Catherine B. Andrew a/k/a Catherine Benjamin Andrew, deceased;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Andrew aka Jerome A. Andrew;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Financial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Money Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5, said names being fictitious, it being the intention of plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or clai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome A. Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard K. Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1-5 and Jane Doe #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE SECRETARY OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, an agency of the UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Represented By: John Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: John Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?