Triplenet Pricing, Inc. v. Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company
Plaintiff: Triplenet Pricing, Inc.
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv03861
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #6 : The time for Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including October 4, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/6/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Piknam Patricia Hunt on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company (aty to be noticed) (Hunt, Ashleigh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Motion, or Other Response to Complaint by Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company. (Gueron, Nicole)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand plc. for Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company. (Gueron, Nicole)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole L. Gueron on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company (aty to be noticed) (Gueron, Nicole)
July 8, 2019 Incorrect Entry Information. The complaint and civil cover sheet in this matter was incorrectly entered today, 7/8/2019, as document # 4. The incorrect entry has been deleted. (Cox, Dwayne)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 11/4/2019 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Adell, April)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
July 3, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653141402 (Doudalis, Evelyn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Triplenet Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Doudalis, Evelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triplenet Pricing, Inc. v. Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triplenet Pricing, Inc.
Represented By: Solomon E. Antar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company
Represented By: Nicole L. Gueron
Represented By: Ashleigh Piknam Patricia Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?